MORGAN v. OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC et al
Plaintiff: RANDY MORGAN
Defendant: LIGHTHOUSE LOBSTER & BAIT LLC, DAVID POTTLE and OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00069
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for DAVID POTTLE : Answer due by 5/18/2020. (aks)
March 26, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for LIGHTHOUSE LOBSTER & BAIT LLC : Answer due by 5/18/2020. (aks)
March 26, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC : Answer due by 5/18/2020. (aks)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC waiver sent on 3/18/2020. (KOERTING, STEPHEN)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed LIGHTHOUSE LOBSTER & BAIT LLC waiver sent on 3/18/2020. (KOERTING, STEPHEN)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed DAVID POTTLE waiver sent on 3/18/2020. (KOERTING, STEPHEN)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIGHTHOUSE LOBSTER & BAIT LLC, OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC, DAVID POTTLE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to David Pottle, #2 Summons Issued as to Lighthouse Lobster & Bait, LLC)(tcs)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen W. Koerting re #1 Complaint filed by RANDY MORGAN. (bfa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIGHTHOUSE LOBSTER & BAIT LLC, OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC, DAVID POTTLE with Jury Demand, filed by RANDY MORGAN. (Service of Process Deadline 6/1/2020)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORGAN v. OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIGHTHOUSE LOBSTER & BAIT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID POTTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN WARRIOR FISHERIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY MORGAN
Represented By: STEPHEN W. KOERTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?