CAIN v. TZOVARRAS et al
Plaintiff: DONALD CAIN
Defendant: HUNTER TZOVARRAS and BRYAN KIRSCH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00070
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk's Office regarding collection of fees. (tcs)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 INDICATION by Prisoner DONALD CAIN of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 5/7/2020. (tcs)
March 17, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 4/7/2020. (MFS)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 4/7/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD CAIN (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope #3 Inmate Statement) Modified on 3/17/2020 to add Inmate Statement and include "Second" (tcs)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER to DONALD CAIN from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout (tcs)
March 3, 2020 Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or new IFP due by 3/24/2020. (MFS)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD CAIN (bfa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by DONALD CAIN (bfa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRYAN KIRSCH, HUNTER TZOVARRAS with Jury Demand, filed by DONALD CAIN. (Service of Process Deadline 6/1/2020) (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 notice of intent to sue, #3 state court filings, #4 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAIN v. TZOVARRAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD CAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER TZOVARRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN KIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?