RATCLIFFE v. BRP US INC et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION, TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC and BRP US INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00234
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Answer to Crossclaim #11 and Cross Claim Against Tidd's Sport Shop, Inc. by BRP US INC. (BROGAN, JONATHAN) Modified on to clean up docket text 8/17/2020 (lrt).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by BRP US INC.(BROGAN, JONATHAN)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATION, BRP US INC by TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC.(FLANAGAN, WILLIAM)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN A. SUSLAK on behalf of TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC (SUSLAK, BRIAN)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. FLANAGAN on behalf of TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC (FLANAGAN, WILLIAM)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE. TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC served on 7/22/2020. (BLACK, ERIK)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE. BRP US INC served on 7/21/2020. (BLACK, ERIK)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for BRP US INC per Summons Returned Executed, Defendant was served on 7/21/2020: Answer due by 8/11/2020. (lrt)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC per Summons Returned Executed, Defendant was served on 7/22/2020: Answer due by 8/12/2020. (lrt)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark B. Decof filed by ERIK M.P. BLACK on behalf of STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2268794.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BLACK, ERIK)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Mega filed by ERIK M.P. BLACK on behalf of STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2268786.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BLACK, ERIK)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas E. Chabot filed by ERIK M.P. BLACK on behalf of STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2268759.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (BLACK, ERIK)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRP US INC, TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons -Tidd's Sport Shop Inc)(jwr)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jwr)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE against ABC CORPORATION, BRP US INC, TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 9/30/2020) Fee due by 7/6/2020.(jwr)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys Decof, Mega and Chabot must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 7/10/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 7/10/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jwr)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2265830.), filed by STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE.(BLACK, ERIK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RATCLIFFE v. BRP US INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIDD'S SPORT SHOP INC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. FLANAGAN
Represented By: BRIAN A. SUSLAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US INC
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN J RATCLIFFE
Represented By: DOUGLAS E. CHABOT
Represented By: ERIK M.P. BLACK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. MEGA
Represented By: MARK B. DECOF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?