CRUTHRIDS v. STATE OF MAINE
Petitioner: CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Case Number: 1:2020cv00249
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus per Order No. 6: Reply due by 9/27/2020. (lrt)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Section 2254 Petition. Time is extended to September 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS Responses due by 9/17/2020. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD filed in paper. (mtm)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STATE OF MAINE. Reply due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(MACOMBER, DONALD)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 9/21/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 17, 2020 Filing Fee Received from CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS: Amount Paid: $5.00. Receipt Number: 120000214. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 7/17/2020 (mtm)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS. (Attachments: #1 Maine Supreme Judicial Court Reporter of Decision, #2 Decision and Order on Post-Conviction Review, #3 Order Denying Certificate of Probable Cause) (jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRUTHRIDS v. STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS
Represented By: HUNTER J. TZOVARRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: DONALD W. MACOMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?