HODGE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: COURTNEY HODGE
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00290
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER : Answer due by 10/13/2020. (tcs)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by COURTNEY HODGE. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail - AG, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail - ORCC, #3 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt - USA)(JACKSON, FRANCIS)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE SONIA on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (SONIA, NICOLE)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Attorney General's Office, #2 Summons Issued as to US Attorney's Office)(tcs)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by COURTNEY HODGE (tcs)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tcs)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by COURTNEY HODGE. (Service of Process Deadline 11/9/2020)(tcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HODGE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY HODGE
Represented By: FRANCIS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: NICOLE SONIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?