GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC v. KMW ENERGY INC
Plaintiff: GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC
Defendant: KMW ENERGY INC and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00293
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (lrt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against KMW ENERGY INC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/4/2021)(GIFFUNE, JOHN)
August 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for KMW ENERGY INC per Waiver of Service Returned Executed: Answer due by 10/13/2020. (lrt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KMW ENERGY INC waiver sent on 8/13/2020. (GIFFUNE, JOHN)
August 14, 2020 Filing Fee Received from GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC: Amount Paid: 400.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2293889. Method of Payment: Credit card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 8/13/2020 (jwr)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC. (GIFFUNE, JOHN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIE J. MUELLER on behalf of GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC (MUELLER, MARIE)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GIFFUNE on behalf of GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC (GIFFUNE, JOHN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KMW ENERGY INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mlm)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mlm)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KMW ENERGY INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/10/2020) Fee due by 8/14/2020.(mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC v. KMW ENERGY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGES RIVER ENERGY LLC
Represented By: A. ROBERT RUESCH
Represented By: MARIE J. MUELLER
Represented By: JOHN P. GIFFUNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMW ENERGY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?