PERRY v. HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC
Plaintiff: TRAVIS PERRY
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC and HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00301
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC waiver sent on 8/24/2020. (WELTE, WILLIAM)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC : Answer due by 10/23/2020. (meh)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2301494.), filed by TRAVIS PERRY.(WELTE, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TRAVIS PERRY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/17/2020) Fee due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - insurance policy)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRY v. HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS PERRY
Represented By: WILLIAM H. WELTE
Represented By: DONALD F. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?