US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. THERIAULT et al
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, LINDA THERIAULT and DONALD F THERIAULT, SR
Case Number: 1:2020cv00338
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Stay for 90 days. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Responses due by 11/27/2020. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
November 2, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: A Motion for Default as to DONALD F THERIAULT, SR and LINDA THERIAULT due by 11/5/2020. (mlm)
October 22, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT per ECF Order #9: Answer due by 11/20/2020. (meh)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Secretary shall respond to the Complaint by November 20, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Second MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT Responses due by 11/12/2020. (EILER, ASHLEY)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Record as of 10.02.2020, #2 Complaint, #3 Secretary's Notice of Removal)(EILER, ASHLEY)
October 6, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney RICHARD W. MCCARTHY, JR. must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 10/13/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (meh)
October 2, 2020 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default for DONALD F THERIAULT, SR and LINDA THERIAULT on 10/30/2020. (meh)
October 2, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT per ECF Order #6: (Answer due by 10/21/2020.), Reset Deadlines : State Court Record due by 10/21/2020 per ECF Order #6 (meh)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting without objection #5 Motion to Extend Time. For good cause shown, the Secretary's deadline for filing the duplicate record and accompanying affidavit of counsel and the deadline for the Secretary to respond to the Complaint are extended to October 21, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1), Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with Procedural Order regarding Removal (ECF No. 3) ( Responses due by 10/21/2020.) by SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (EILER, ASHLEY)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/30/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Somerset County, case number SKOSC-RE-20-09., filed by SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Service of Process Deadline 12/22/2020) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - complaint)(bfa)
September 23, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/30/2020. (bfa)
September 23, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, Donald F. Theriault, Sr, Linda Theriault : Answer due by 9/30/2020. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. THERIAULT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA THERIAULT
Represented By: RICHARD W. MCCARTHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD F THERIAULT, SR
Represented By: RICHARD W. MCCARTHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: DONALD E. FRECHETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?