FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. SMALT
Plaintiff: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Defendant: LARRY J SMALT
Case Number: 1:2021cv00041
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (DOONAN, JOHN)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 4, 2021 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement as to FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION due by 2/11/2021. (tcs)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LARRY J SMALT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LARRY J SMALT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 5/4/2021) Fee due by 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B-Note, #3 Exhibit C-Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D-Payoff Calculation, #5 Exhibit E-Affidavit Related to Military Search)(clp) Modified on 2/3/2021 to clean up docket text (clp).
February 3, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2435274.), filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. SMALT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY J SMALT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?