RACKLIFF v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: SCOTT RACKLIFF
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00067
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN D. SANTEN on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (SANTEN, SEAN)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(clp)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Additional Attachments. Modified on 3/25/2021 to indicate filed in error from Clerk's Office. The parties should disregard the filing. Counsel contacted and will submit summonses in accordance with Local Rules. (clp)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR**ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by SCOTT RACKLIFF re #1 Complaint Proposed Summonses to be Issued by Clerk.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Summons #2, #2 Supplement Proposed Summons #3)(GOETZ, DAVID) Modified on 3/25/2021 to indicate filed in error from Clerk's Office. The parties should disregard the filing. Counsel contacted and will submit summonses in accordance with Local Rules. (clp).
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David B Goetz filed by RILEY L. FENNER on behalf of SCOTT RACKLIFF (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2457936.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (FENNER, RILEY)
March 4, 2021 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney DAVID GOETZ must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 3/12/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SCOTT RACKLIFF (bfa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by SCOTT RACKLIFF. (Service of Process Deadline 6/1/2021)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RACKLIFF v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT RACKLIFF
Represented By: RILEY L. FENNER
Represented By: DAVID B. GOETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: SEAN D. SANTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?