FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. MICHAUD et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: JOEL S MICHAUD and LORI A MICHAUD
Case Number: 1:2021cv00069
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FORECLOSURE PROCEDURAL ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SEEK A DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE. Any motion to proceed on a paper record due by 6/1/2021. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (slg)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of MDJ)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to JOEL S MICHAUD and LORI A MICHAUD. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 6/1/2021. By Melody Dalphonse, Deputy Clerk (mnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 5/17/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 31, 2021 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by JOEL S MICHAUD or LORI A MICHAUD. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 4/30/2021. (mnd)
March 25, 2021 Corrected Set Answer Deadline for JOEL S MICHAUD, LORI A MICHAUD Per Summons Returned #5 and #6: Answer due by 3/30/2021. (slg)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. LORI A MICHAUD served on 3/9/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 3/25/2021 to correct date of service (slg).
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. JOEL S MICHAUD served on 3/9/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 3/25/2021 to correct date of service (slg).
March 24, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for JOEL S MICHAUD, LORI A MICHAUD per return of Summons: Answer due by 3/29/2021. (slg)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (DOONAN, JOHN)
March 5, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2458621.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(DOONAN, JOHN)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JOEL S MICHAUD, LORI A MICHAUD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons - L. Michaud)(aks)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (aks)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOEL S MICHAUD, LORI A MICHAUD PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 6/2/2021) Fee due by 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, #5 Exhibit E Corrective Assignment into BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into MTGLQ Investors, #8 Exhibit H Quitclaim Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #9 Exhibit I Assignment into Wilmington Trust, #10 Exhibit J Assignment into MTGLQ Investors, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit of Missing Assignment, #12 Exhibit L Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #13 Exhibit M Demand Letter, #14 Exhibit N Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(aks)
March 4, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/11/2021. (aks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. MICHAUD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL S MICHAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI A MICHAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?