JAMES v. MORIN et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHN JAMES
Defendant: CAPT PATRICK COCKTEN, CAPT BRUCE DOMENICH, CHAD COOPER, CAPT DONALD DILLIN, SGT JAMIE EMERSON, JEFF MORIN, RANDALL LIBERTY, CHAD CURTIS, SGT KUESBURT, LT TYRELL, OFFICER DUNN, JENNIFER DUFFY-VAIL, DR RYAN THORNELL, RN KIM PARTRIDGE and JOSEPH FITZPATRICK
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2021cv00076
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER mooting #9 Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's earlier voluntary notices of dismissal (ECF No. 7) (ECF No. 8), Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 9) is moot. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), this action has been dismissed and the case terminated. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 Additional Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnd)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re certain attachments to #1 Complaint filed by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES (Attachment #2, Universal Assessment dated 5/29/09; Attachment 3, Universal Assessment dated 10/24/07; Attachment 4, Initial/Annual Comprehensive Psychosocial Assessment dated 8/7/07; Attachment 5, Initial Annual Comprehensive Psychosocial Assessment dated 2/11/12; Attachment 7, Psychiatric Admission Assessment dated 10/3/06; and Attachment 8, Sick Call Slips). Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (mnd)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See footnote 1 of this Amended Order for the correction. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 4/12/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Per Amended Order #5, Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 4/12/2021. (MFS)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 4/9/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 19, 2021 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 4/9/2021. (MFS)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES re #1 Complaint. Main Document: Maine Department of Corrections Prisoner Grievance Paperwork. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnd)
March 18, 2021 Case Randomly Reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES (Attachments: #1 trust account statement)(bfa)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PATRICK COCKTEN, CHAD COOPER, CHAD CURTIS, DONALD DILLIN, BRUCE DOMENICH, JENNIFER DUFFY-VAIL, DUNN, JAMIE EMERSON, JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, KUESBURT, RANDALL LIBERTY, JEFF MORIN, KIM PARTRIDGE, RYAN THORNELL, TYRELL, filed by MICHAEL JOHN JAMES. (Service of Process Deadline 6/16/2021) (Attachments: #1 page 2 of complaint, #2 5/29/09 assessment, #3 10/24/07 assessment, #4 8/7/07 assessment, #5 2/11/12 assessment, #6 7/22/13 physical exam, #7 10/3/06 admission assessment, #8 sick call slip, #9 prisoner grievance form, #10 envelope, #11 cover letter)(bfa) Modified on 3/18/2021 (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. MORIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPT PATRICK COCKTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPT BRUCE DOMENICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPT DONALD DILLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT JAMIE EMERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF MORIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD CURTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT KUESBURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT TYRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER DUFFY-VAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR RYAN THORNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN KIM PARTRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH FITZPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHN JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?