WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 v. HOULE et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1
Defendant: EUGENE O HOULE and WANDA HOULE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00078
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to WANDA HOULE By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Wanda Houle by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 Responses due by 6/4/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 21, 2021 Set Deadline as to WANDA HOULE as no answer/responsive pleading has been filed with the court: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 5/21/2021. (clp)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. WANDA HOULE served on 3/30/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 6, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for WANDA HOULE in accordance with ECF #7 Summons returned executed served 3/30/2021: Answer due by 4/20/2021. (clp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Response to Court's Order by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. (DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 3/26/2021 to correct name of filing counsel (clp).
March 24, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2468014.), filed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EUGENE O HOULE, WANDA HOULE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Wanda Houle summons)(bfa)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EUGENE O HOULE, WANDA HOULE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1. (Service of Process Deadline 6/21/2021) Fee due by 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Loan Modification Agreement, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into HSBC Bank USA NA, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #7 Exhibit G Quitclaim Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #8 Exhibit H Assignment into MTGLQ Investors, LP, #9 Exhibit I Assignment into Wilmington Trust, #10 Exhibit J Demand Letter, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
March 23, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/30/2021. (bfa)
March 23, 2021 Set Deadlines Per procedural order #4: The plaintiff mortgagee shall notify the Court by April 2, 2021, whether this action for foreclosure is subject to the federal moratorium and if counsel believes the Court is misinterpreting the Orders from the Governor, the Supreme Judicial Court, and the President, counsel shall explain their position due by 4/2/2021. (clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 v. HOULE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE O HOULE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA HOULE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?