BOULIER v. PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: WAYNE E BOULIER, JR
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFF, PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL, TROY MORTON, PCJ JAIL ADMIN, RICHARD CLUKEY and PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPT
Case Number: 1:2021cv00080
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court finds no reason to reconsider its order denying Plaintiff's prior motion to appoint counsel. Any objection to this order shall be made in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrt)
May 13, 2021 Filing 21 MAIL (ECF#17- Order for Service and USM Service Form) sent to Wayne E. Boulier, Jr returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return to Sender Not at this Address. (mtm)
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 MAIL (ECF #16- Order on Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction) sent to Wayne E. Boulier, Jr returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return to Sender Not at This Address. (mtm)
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RICHARD CLUKEY, TROY MORTON, PCJ JAIL ADMIN, PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL, PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFF and PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPT waivers sent on 5/4/2021. Defendants' Answers due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Executed as to Penobscot County Jail, #2 Waiver Executed as to Troy Morton/Penobscot County Sheriff, #3 Waiver Executed as to Richard Clukey/PCJ Jail Admin)(tcs) Modified on 5/11/2021 to correct typo (tcs).
May 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal may attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver(s) is/are timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service in hand by the U.S. Marshal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
May 3, 2021 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (tcs)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EMERGENCY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ON SERVICE OF PROCESS dismissing without prejudice #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting Motion for Service of the Complaint By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 MAIL (ECF Nos. 7 & 9) sent to Wayne Boulier, Jr. returned as undeliverable. Reason: Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward. (tcs)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER from Clerk's Office regarding collection of fees. (tcs)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 INDICATION by Prisoner WAYNE E BOULIER, JR of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tcs)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Segregation Status Placement 4/2/21, #2 Exhibit 2 - Administrative Segregation Status Placement 4/5/21)(tcs)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due by 4/29/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 8, 2021 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 4/29/2021. (MFS)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 Account Activity Ledger, #2 Balance History, #3 Envelope)(tcs)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 25, 2021 Set Deadlines: Fee or new Application to Proceed in forma pauperis due by 4/8/2021. (MFS)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR (Attachments: #1 list of commissary items purchased and balance, #2 affidavit to motion for ifp)(bfa)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD CLUKEY, TROY MORTON, PCJ JAIL ADMIN, PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL, PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFF, PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPT, filed by WAYNE E BOULIER, JR. (Service of Process Deadline 6/22/2021) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOULIER v. PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY MORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCJ JAIL ADMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CLUKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE E BOULIER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?