KINNEY v. AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD MORGAN KINNEY
Defendant: RON OLDFEILD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER THORN, ALISON OUELETT and AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00093
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed RON OLDFEILD waiver sent on 5/13/2021.Answer due by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jwr)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ALISON OUELETT waiver sent on 5/13/2021.Answer due by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jwr)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal as to Defendants ALISON OUELETT and RON OLDFEILD. The U.S. Marshal may attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver(s) is/are timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service in hand by the U.S. Marshal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
May 11, 2021 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (jwr)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL, THORN.(MARCHESI, PETER)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Business Office regarding collection of fees. (mlm)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion Regarding Filing Fee. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 INDICATION by Prisoner RICHARD MORGAN KINNEY of Intent to Proceed (NO PDF Attached see pleading #4) (mlm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Regarding Filing Fee Payment by RICHARD MORGAN KINNEY (Attachments: #1 Washington County Jail Records, #2 Envelope)(mlm)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 4/27/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 6, 2021 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 4/27/2021. (MFS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD MORGAN KINNEY (Attachments: #1 commissary statement)(bfa)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL, RON OLDFEILD, ALISON OUELETT, THORN, filed by RICHARD MORGAN KINNEY. (Service of Process Deadline 7/1/2021) (Attachments: #1 complaint page 2, #2 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINNEY v. AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON OLDFEILD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER THORN
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISON OUELETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MORGAN KINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?