WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. POTTER et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB doing business as CHRISTIANA TRUST NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUT AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST
Defendant: BARBARA PINETTE
Cross Claimant: BARBARA J POTTER
Not Classified By Court: MICHAEL D POTTER
Interested Party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2021cv00202
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/11/2022. Motions due by 2/25/2022. Ready for Trial on 5/3/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to MICHAEL D POTTER. Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 10/18/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Stacey L. Graf. (slg) Modified on 9/17/2021 to reflect Order issued by the Clerk's Office (slg).
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Michael D. Potter by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB Responses due by 10/8/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 18, 2021 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by Michael D. Potter. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 9/17/2021. (mnd)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Priority Position)(CROSMAN, KEVIN) Modified on 8/17/2021 to clean up duplicate exhibit text (mnd).
August 17, 2021 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by Maine Revenue Services - Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 9/16/2021. (mnd)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against MICHAEL D POTTER filed by BARBARA J POTTER.(BALDACCI, JOHN) Modified on 8/13/2021 to clean up text (mnd).
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 7/26/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. MICHAEL D POTTER served on 7/27/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. BARBARA J POTTER served on 7/27/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 6, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE REVENUE SERVICES - Per Summons Returned Executed #7: Answer due by 8/16/2021. (mnd)
August 6, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for BARBARA J POTTER - Per Summons Returned Executed #5: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (mnd)
August 6, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MICHAEL D POTTER - Per Summons Retuned Executed #6: Answer due by 8/17/2021. (mnd)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, BARBARA J POTTER, MICHAEL D POTTER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Michael D. Potter summons, #2 Maine Revenue Services summons)(bfa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARBARA J POTTER, MICHAEL D POTTER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. (Service of Process Deadline 10/18/2021) Fee due by 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Quitclaim Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Wilmington Savings Fund Society, #6 Exhibit F Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit G Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
July 20, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2523630.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 20, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/27/2021. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. POTTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: BARBARA J POTTER
Represented By: JOHN E. BALDACCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB doing business as CHRISTIANA TRUST NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUT AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA PINETTE
Represented By: JOHN E. BALDACCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MICHAEL D POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?