RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC v. DONAHUE et al
Plaintiff: RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC
Defendant: DOUGLAS M DONAHUE, DALE SIMONDS, DAVID SIMONDS and KIMBERLY DAIGLE
Interested Party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD
Case Number: 1:2021cv00276
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Foreclosure (aks)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; granting #12 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NATIONAL ASSOCIATION By DEPUTY CLERK: Amy Spencer (aks)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default of Capital One Bank (USA) National Association by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC Responses due by 11/26/2021. (SLEEPER, F.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default of Midland Funding LLC by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC Responses due by 11/26/2021. (SLEEPER, F.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 10/14/2021. (SLEEPER, F.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/6/2021. (SLEEPER, F.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC re #1 Complaint,,,,,, #3 Summons Issued,,, on Capital One Bank (USA) National Association (SLEEPER, F.) Modified on 11/5/2021 (aks).
November 5, 2021 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 11/29/2021 as to MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. (aks)
November 5, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Answer due by 10/28/2021. (aks)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC. MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on 10/7/2021. (SLEEPER, F.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(EILER, ASHLEY)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E. EILER on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (EILER, ASHLEY)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC (SLEEPER, F.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, KIMBERLY DAIGLE, DOUGLAS M DONAHUE, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD, DALE SIMONDS, DAVID SIMONDS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Dale Simonds summons, #2 David Simonds summons, #3 Douglas M. Donahue summons, #4 Kimberly Daigle summons, #5 Midland Funding LLC summons, #6 Riverwalk Holdings, Ltd. summons, #7 United States Attorneys Office summons)(bfa)
September 28, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2021. (bfa)
September 28, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2554710.), filed by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC.(SLEEPER, F.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIMBERLY DAIGLE, DOUGLAS M DONAHUE, DALE SIMONDS, DAVID SIMONDS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/27/2021) Fee due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tax Lien Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Note, including the Allonge, #5 Exhibit E - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment of Mortgage to CF Servicing, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment of Mortgage to Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment of Mortgage to Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, #9 Exhibit I - Assignment of Mortgage to Home Investment Fund V, LP, #10 Exhibit J - Assignment of Mortgage to AMD Trust, LLC, #11 Exhibit K - Assignment of Mortgage to the Plaintiff, #12 Exhibit L First Adjustment Agreement, #13 Exhibit M - Second Adjustment Agreement, #14 Exhibit N - Third Adjustment Agreement, #15 Exhibit O - Fourth Adjustment Agreement, #16 Exhibit P - Fifth Adjustment Agreement, #17 Exhibit Q - Sixth Adjustment Agreement, #18 Exhibit R - Midland Writ, #19 Exhibit S - Capital One Writ, #20 Exhibit T - Riverwalk Writ, #21 Exhibit U - Notice and evidence of the mailing)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC v. DONAHUE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RED STICK ACQUISITIONS LLC
Represented By: F. BRUCE SLEEPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS M DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE SIMONDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SIMONDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY DAIGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?