DELVA et al v. EAGLE'S LODGE INC
Plaintiff: JEANINE DELVA, MARIE DENISE DERISSE, MARIE MYRLENE HALL-HOLLY, PIERRE INNOCENT and RENE JOLTEUS
Defendant: EAGLE'S LODGE INC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00336
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1801
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting without objection #14 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. On the showing made, the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 10, is amended as follows: the deadline for the Rule 26(f) conference is extended to February 1, 2022; any objection to the scheduling order shall be filed by February 8, 2022; and the parties shall exchange initial disclosures by February 15, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 19, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by JEANINE DELVA, MARIE DENISE DERISSE, MARIE MYRLENE HALL-HOLLY, PIERRE INNOCENT, RENE JOLTEUS Responses due by 2/9/2022. (GUARE, MICHAEL)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: Motion has been marked as filed in error. Counsel have been contacted to refile at the Clerk's Office request. (mmy)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 **FILED IN ERROR** Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by JEANINE DELVA Responses due by 2/9/2022. (GUARE, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/19/2022 to indicate Motion was filed in error (mmy).
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EAGLE'S LODGE INC. (DRUARY, J.)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/31/2022. Motions due by 6/14/2022. Ready for Trial on 8/2/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mmy)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by EAGLE'S LODGE INC.(DRUARY, J.)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by January 18, 2022 (January 16 and 17 being a Sunday and holiday, respectively). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
December 30, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for EAGLE'S LODGE, INC. per Order #8: Answer due by 1/18/2022. (mmy)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by EAGLE'S LODGE INC Responses due by 1/19/2022. (DRUARY, J.)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN L. MURPHY on behalf of EAGLE'S LODGE INC. (mmy)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR on behalf of EAGLE'S LODGE INC (DRUARY, J.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JEANINE DELVA. EAGLE'S LODGE INC served on 12/17/2021. (GUARE, MICHAEL)
December 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service for EAGLE'S LODGE INC: Answer due by 1/7/2022. (mmy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EAGLE'S LODGE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EAGLE'S LODGE INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MARIE DENISE DERISSE, JEANINE DELVA, MARIE MYRLENE HALL-HOLLY, RENE JOLTEUS, PIERRE INNOCENT. (Service of Process Deadline 2/28/2022) Fee due by 12/2/2021.(bfa)
November 30, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2584348.), filed by MARIE DENISE DERISSE, JEANINE DELVA, MARIE MYRLENE HALL-HOLLY, RENE JOLTEUS, PIERRE INNOCENT.(GROENEVELD-MEIJER, NICOLAAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELVA et al v. EAGLE'S LODGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANINE DELVA
Represented By: MICHAEL GUARE
Represented By: NICOLAAS W. GROENEVELD-MEIJER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE DENISE DERISSE
Represented By: MICHAEL GUARE
Represented By: NICOLAAS W. GROENEVELD-MEIJER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE MYRLENE HALL-HOLLY
Represented By: MICHAEL GUARE
Represented By: NICOLAAS W. GROENEVELD-MEIJER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRE INNOCENT
Represented By: MICHAEL GUARE
Represented By: NICOLAAS W. GROENEVELD-MEIJER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE JOLTEUS
Represented By: MICHAEL GUARE
Represented By: NICOLAAS W. GROENEVELD-MEIJER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE'S LODGE INC
Represented By: ERIN L. MURPHY
Represented By: J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?