UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $53,171 IN US CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $53,171 IN US CURRENCY
Claimant: CHAD BUBIER
Case Number: 1:2021cv00358
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion to Stay through May 9, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay for 90 days through May 9, 2022 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 3/1/2022. (CLARK, DONALD)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 CLAIM by CHAD BUBIER. (HESS, SCOTT)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT F. HESS on behalf of CHAD BUBIER (HESS, SCOTT)
February 8, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for CHAD BUBIER: Answer due by 3/1/2022. (mmy)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to $53,171 IN US CURRENCY served on 1/10/2022. (CLARK, DONALD)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT In Rem Issued By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $53,171 IN US CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 3/14/2022)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2021: #1 proposed warrant in-rem) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $53,171 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DONALD E. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $53,171 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: CHAD BUBIER
Represented By: SCOTT F. HESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?