AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP v. CAMPO, ESQ
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP
Defendant: BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ
Interested Party: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 1:2022cv00048
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 8/25/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey L. Graf. (slg)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-In-Interest by AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP Responses due by 5/5/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 4, 2022 Case REFERRAL Reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/4/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/11/2022. Motions due by 8/25/2022. Ready for Trial on 11/8/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 18, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT on 4/15/2022. (tcs)
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ.(CAMPO, BENJAMIN)
March 16, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ and SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT on 4/15/2022. (tcs)
March 11, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ on 4/11/2022. (tcs)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP. SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 2/22/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 8, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT: Answer due by 3/15/2022. (tcs)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ served on 2/17/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 2/18/2022 to clarify docket text (lrt).
February 18, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ per Acceptance of Service: Answer due by 3/10/2022. (lrt)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ, SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Secretary of Housing & Urban Development summons)(bfa)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP. (Service of Process Deadline 5/18/2022) Fee due by 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment to American Advisors Group, #5 Exhibit E Demand, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
February 17, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2619161.), filed by AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 17, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/24/2022. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP v. CAMPO, ESQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN P CAMPO, ESQ
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. CAMPO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?