JORDAN v. CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JORDAN individually and doing business as JR FABRICATION
Defendant: CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00136
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JUSTIN JORDAN. CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC served on 5/16/2022. (HODGINS, MICHAEL)
May 16, 2022 Filing Fee Received from JUSTIN JORDAN: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2651386. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 5/11/2022 (mmy)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JUSTIN JORDAN. (Service of Process Deadline 8/9/2022) Fee due by 5/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - invoice, #2 Exhibit B - delivery invoice, #3 Exhibit C - revocation)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN v. CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JORDAN individually and doing business as JR FABRICATION
Represented By: ALFRED JOSEPH FALZONE, III
Represented By: MICHAEL A. HODGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROPAC EQUIPMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?