US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. SHELLEY
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: MARY S SHELLEY
Interested Party: GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC and SHARON A SHELLEY
Case Number: 1:2022cv00181
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE: Recently MARY S SHELLEY filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at #https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (clp)
July 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE re [10-1] Answer to Complaint filed by MARY S SHELLEY. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (clp)
July 21, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Foreclosure Complaint by MARY S SHELLEY. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation, #2 Envelope)(clp)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING MATTER FOR MEDIATION IN THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM granting #8 Motion REFER MATTER TO THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM AND STAY By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp)
July 21, 2022 Set Deadlines per order no. 9: Status Report due by 9/6/2022. (clp)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION REFER MATTER TO THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM AND STAY by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Responses due by 8/10/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 20, 2022 Set Deadlines as to MARY S SHELLEY, GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC, SHARON A SHELLEY as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/19/2022. (clp)
July 19, 2022 Set Deadlines as to GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/18/2022. (clp)
July 15, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC served on 6/27/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. MARY S SHELLEY served on 6/28/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. SHARON A SHELLEY served on 6/28/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 15, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for SHARON A SHELLEY in accordance with ECF No. 5 Summons Returned Executed Served 6/28/2022: Answer due by 7/19/2022. (clp)
July 15, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for MARY S SHELLEY in accordance with ECF No. 6 Summons Returned Executed Served 6/28/2022: Answer due by 7/19/2022. (clp)
July 15, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC in accordance with ECF No. 7 Affidavit of Service Filed Served 6/27/2022: Answer due by 7/18/2022. (clp)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARY S SHELLEY, SHARON A SHELLEY, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Sharon Shelley summons, #2 Gemini Capital Group LLC summons)(bfa)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARY S SHELLEY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 9/7/2022) Fee due by 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into U.S. Bank National Association, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into U.S. Bank National Association, #6 Exhibit F Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit G Lifetime Real Estate Lease, #8 Exhibit H- Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
June 9, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/16/2022. (bfa)
June 9, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2662503.), filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. SHELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY S SHELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SHARON A SHELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?