US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. TAYLOR
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: KEVIN L TAYLOR
Interested Party: FLEET NATIONAL BANK and BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 1:2022cv00186
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FLEET NATIONAL BANK, KEVIN L TAYLOR. Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 8/18/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant and Parties-in-Interest by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Responses due by 8/9/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 15, 2022 Set Deadlines as to BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FLEET NATIONAL BANK, KEVIN L TAYLOR as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/15/2022. (clp)
July 14, 2022 Set Deadlines as to BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FLEET NATIONAL BANK no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/15/2022. (clp)
July 13, 2022 Set Deadlines as to FLEET NATIONAL BANK as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/12/2022. (clp)
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. FLEET NATIONAL BANK served on 6/21/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION served on 6/22/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 30, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION in accordance with ECF No. 6 Summons Returned Executed - Served 6/22/2022: Answer due by 7/13/2022. (clp)
June 30, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for FLEET NATIONAL BANK in accordance with ECF No. 7 Summons Returned Executed - Served 6/21/2022: Answer due by 7/12/2022. (clp)
June 29, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. KEVIN L TAYLOR served on 6/23/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 29, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for KEVIN L TAYLOR in accordance with ECF No. 5 Affidavit of Service filed served 6/23/2022: Answer due by 7/14/2022. (clp)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, FLEET NATIONAL BANK, KEVIN L TAYLOR. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Fleet National Bank summons, #2 Brewer Federal Credit Union summons)(bfa)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN L TAYLOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 9/12/2022) Fee due by 6/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Consumer Note and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Nationstar Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Bank of America, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank National Association, #7 Exhibit G- Demand Package, #8 Exhibit H Affidavit relating to Military search)(bfa)
June 14, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2663961.), filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 14, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/21/2022. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN L TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FLEET NATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BREWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?