RICHARDS v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Plaintiff: JEROME G RICHARDS, II
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE, PENOBSCOT COUNTY COURTHOUSE and SOMERSET COUNTY COURTHOUSE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00388
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT By DEPUTY CLERK: M. York(mmy)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mmy)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENOBSCOT COUNTY COURTHOUSE, SOMERSET COUNTY COURTHOUSE, STATE OF MAINE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JEROME G RICHARDS, II. (Service of Process Deadline 3/8/2023) Fee due by 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDS v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME G RICHARDS, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY COURTHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOMERSET COUNTY COURTHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?