CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC v. CRAM
Plaintiff: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Defendant: MICAH R CRAM
Case Number: 1:2022cv00410
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Eligibility for Foreclosure Diversion Program by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC (FOLSOM, CARRIE)
February 7, 2023 Set Deadlines as to MICAH R CRAM as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 3/9/2023. (clp)
February 6, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for MICAH R CRAM in accordance with ECF No. 7 Summons Returned Executed served 1/15/2023: Answer due by 2/6/2023. (clp)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. MICAH R CRAM served on 1/15/2023. (FOLSOM, CARRIE)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (FOLSOM, CARRIE)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (FOLSOM, CARRIE)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC re #1 Complaint,, .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Note, #2 Exhibit B: Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C: Assignments, #4 Exhibit D: Demands)(FOLSOM, CARRIE)
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICAH R CRAM. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICAH R CRAM PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 3/23/2023) Fee due by 12/27/2022. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2022.(clp)
December 23, 2022 Set Deadlines as to CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2022. (clp)
December 23, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2741798.), filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC.(FOLSOM, CARRIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC v. CRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: CARRIE FOLSOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICAH R CRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?