FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. FAULKINGHAM
Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Defendant: NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM
Interested Party: DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00411
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation in the Maine Foreclosure Diversion Program. Status Report due by 3/27/2023. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mnd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to REFER MATTER TO THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM AND STAY - By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mnd)
February 9, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION REFER MATTER TO THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM AND STAY by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION Responses due by 3/2/2023. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: ELIGIBILITY OF DEFENDANT FOR THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 27, 2023 Set Deadlines as to NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM as no answer or responsive pleading was filed: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 2/27/2023. (clp)
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM served on 1/6/2023. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 1/19/2023 to correctly reflect the date served as 1/6/2023 (clp).
January 19, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM in accordance with ECF no. 9 Summons Returned Executed Served 1/6/2023: Answer due by 1/26/2023. (clp)
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 1/4/2023. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 6, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE in accordance with ECF No. 8-Affidavit of Service filed served 1/4/23: Answer due by 3/6/2023. (clp)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Civil Cover Sheet. Marked as filed in error by Clerk's Office. Document filed in wrong case. (slg)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR***CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg) Modified on 12/30/2022 to mark filed in error. Document filed in wrong case (slg).
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service)(jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION against DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 3/23/2023) Fee due by 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B- Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Quitclaim Assignment into Nationstar Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Nationstar Mortgage, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into Select Portfolio Servicing, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, #8 Exhibit H Demand Package, #9 Exhibit I Affidavit regarding Military Status)(jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2741890.), filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. FAULKINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN A FAULKINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?