PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Plaintiff: PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of HMG Inc doing business as COMFORT INN
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00083
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Rome. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
May 8, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION by Attorney Judah Rome to Withdraw as Attorney by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 5/29/2024. (DUGGAN, TIMOTHY)
May 6, 2024 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Withdrawal of Counsel by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY (ROME, JUDAH) Modified on 5/6/2024 to mark as filed in error, counsel has been instructed to refile (jam).
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JOSEPH DUGGAN on behalf of PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY (DUGGAN, TIMOTHY)
May 6, 2024 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - Per Order No. 12: Discovery due by 2/4/2025. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/11/2025. Motions due by 2/25/2025. Ready for Trial on 5/6/2025. (jam)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part #11 Objection to Scheduling Order. I disagree that this matter should be placed on the Complex Track. It is a straightforward product liability case with two parties. Moreover, the fact that the parties wish to conduct fact discovery before proceeding with expert disclosures and discovery is not unusual, and they are free to do so. As previously, I will set an overall discovery deadline within which all discovery is to be complete. The amended deadlines are as follows: Plaintiff shall disclose experts by October 15, 2024. Defendant shall disclose experts by December 3, 2024. All discovery shall be complete by February 4, 2025. Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Need for Pre-Filing Conference due by February 11, 2025. Dispositive motions and Daubert/Kumho motions due February 25, 2025. Case ready for trial on May 6, 2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
May 1, 2024 Filing 11 Joint OBJECTION to #10 Scheduling Order, and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 5/22/2024. (ROME, JUDAH)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/3/2024. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/10/2024. Motions due by 9/24/2024. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jam)
April 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re #8 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Attorney ANDREW D. BLACK for BROAN-NUTONE LLC added to this specific case only. (lrt)
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Black filed by PETER M. DURNEY on behalf of BROAN-NUTONE LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2940391.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (DURNEY, PETER)
April 15, 2024 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BROAN-NUTONE LLC. (DURNEY, PETER)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(DURNEY, PETER)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY. BROAN-NUTONE LLC served on 3/26/2024. (ROME, JUDAH)
March 28, 2024 Set Answer Deadline for BROAN-NUTONE LLC Per executed summons No. 5: Answer due by 4/16/2024. (jam)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY. (ROME, JUDAH)
March 20, 2024 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2929742.), filed by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY.(ROME, JUDAH)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BROAN-NUTONE LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (cjd)
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROAN-NUTONE LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 6/17/2024) Fee due by 3/21/2024.(cjd)
March 19, 2024 Set Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 3/26/2024. (cjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of HMG Inc doing business as COMFORT INN
Represented By: JUDAH ROME
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH DUGGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Represented By: ANDREW D. BLACK
Represented By: PETER M. DURNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?