RICHES v. FEDERAL JUDICIAL SYSTEM et al Featured Case

Plaintiff sued the Federal Judicial System, all U.S. federal judges, U.S. marshals and ... Tiger Woods. Plaintiff seeks over $213 trillion from defendants and alleges that U.S. federal judges stole his copyrighted name and sold it to Google.com, who defamed him with lies on Google. Plaintiff also charges that Tiger Woods is touring the PGA golf courses with plaintiff\'s identity in his pocket and that Woods will not answer his prison phone calls.

Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEE RICHES
Defendant: FEDERAL JUDICIAL SYSTEM, UNITED STATES FEDERAL JUDGES, UNITED STATES MARSHALLS and TIGER WOODS
Case Number: 2:2007cv00124
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2007 9
APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: 8 Notice of Appeal (jgw, )
September 7, 2007 8
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 6 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Recusal by JONATHAN LEE RICHES. Transcript Order form mailed to pro se plaintiff along with application/affidavit to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (jgw, )
August 28, 2007 7
JUDGMENT of dismissal By Walentine, DEPUTY CLERK. (jgw, )
August 24, 2007 4
Pro Se MOTION for Recusal of Magistrate Judge Kravchuk by JONATHAN LEE RICHES. (jgw, )
August 8, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint,, filed by JONATHAN LEE RICHES Objections to R&R due by 8/27/2007 By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (err, )
July 17, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
July 16, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against FEDERAL JUDICIAL SYSTEM, UNITED STATES FEDERAL JUDGES, UNITED STATES MARSHALLS, TIGER WOODS

IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO IMMEDIATELY LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY.

IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CHECK, THE COURT REQUIRES RECEIPT OF PAYMENT WITHIN 48 HOURS OF THIS FILING., filed by JONATHAN LEE RICHES.(Service of Process Deadline 11/13/2007)(bfa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHES v. FEDERAL JUDICIAL SYSTEM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEE RICHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL JUDICIAL SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FEDERAL JUDGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MARSHALLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIGER WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?