CHARALAMBOUS v. CHARALAMBOUS
Petitioner: SAVVAS CHARALAMBOUS
Respondent: ELIZABETH ROHNERT CHARALAMBOUS
Case Number: 2:2010cv00375
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Androscoggin
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER FOLLOWING MANDATE re: granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion Enforcement Order By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REGARDING TEMPORARY CUSTODY granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion for Order By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROCEDURAL ORDER re 101 MOTION for Emergency Motion To Modify Stay filed by SAVVAS CHARALAMBOUS, Deadline to Surrender passports by 11/12/2010 at 10:00 a.m. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON PETITIONERS EMERGENCY MOTION denying as moot 88 Motion to Stay; denying 93 Motion for Temporary Custody By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ON RESPONDENTS EMERGENCY MOTIONS granting 76 Motion to Extend Time; denying 77 Motion to Stay; mooting 81 Motion for Clarification By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PRE-HEARING ORDER & REPORT OF CONFERENCE granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Relating to the Protection of Witnesses from Cyprus or in the Alternative to Sequester Witnesses By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INTERIM CONTACT granting without objection 35 Motion for Interim Contact. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER denying 19 Motion for TRO By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING REVISED REDACTED FILING By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT OF CONFERENCE & SCHEDULING ORDER granting 3 Motion for Expedited Consideration ; mooting 3 Motion for Order to Show Cause. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mnw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHARALAMBOUS v. CHARALAMBOUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAVVAS CHARALAMBOUS
Represented By: DAVID S ABRAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ELIZABETH ROHNERT CHARALAMBOUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?