GOLDENSON et al v. STEFFENS et al

Plaintiff: DANIEL R GOLDENSON, SUZANNE K GOLDENSON, SKG PARTNERS LP and SKG GENERAL CORP
Defendant: JOHN L STEFFENS, GREGORY P HO, SPRING MOUNTAIN CAPITAL GP LLC, SPRING MOUNTAIN CAPITAL LP and SPRING MOUNTAIN CAPITAL LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00440
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 296 Objection to Deposition Designations; denying 297 Motion to Strike. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER overruling in part, sustaining in part and deferring ruling in part 277 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' deposition designations. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 249 Motion to Bifurcate; denying 250 Motion to Compel Offer of Proof; granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Relating to Indemnification and Prior Representa tion by Simpson Thacher; denying 253 Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Testifying as to Any Analyses Performed on Ascot; denying 254 Motion in Limine Concerning the Defendants' Redactions of Relevant Information; denying 254 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER sustaining in part and otherwise denying 188 Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Submission of Costs By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER denying 163 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Sonia M. Brooks, CPA; denying 165 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Robert A. Strong; denying 167 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Patrick E. Conroy; denying 169 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Arthur Laby. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying 161 Plaintiffs' Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; denying 162 Defendants' Partial Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying 148 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court ; affirming Report and Recommended Decision re 136 Report and Recommendations; denying 106 Motion for Sanctions By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion to Strike Expert Designation. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jlg)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ALLOW LATE EXPERT DESIGNATION AND FURTHER DISCOVERY - granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Leave to File Designation of Expert Out of Time and Motion for Order for Additional Discovery. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 14 Motion for Ruling on Choice of Law By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOLDENSON et al v. STEFFENS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL R GOLDENSON
Represented By: SHAUN GARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE K GOLDENSON
Represented By: SHAUN GARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKG PARTNERS LP
Represented By: SHAUN GARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKG GENERAL CORP
Represented By: SHAUN GARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN L STEFFENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY P HO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRING MOUNTAIN CAPITAL GP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRING MOUNTAIN CAPITAL LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRING MOUNTAIN CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?