LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC v. UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND et al
Plaintiff: LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC and DR PAUL LECAT
Defendant: RYAN ELING and UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND
Case Number: 2:2012cv00283
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONSENT DECREE. It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Entry of Consent Decree By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
March 19, 2013 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree by PAUL LECAT, LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC Responses due by 4/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(WEBB, NATHAN)
March 8, 2013 Filing 26 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (dfr)
March 8, 2013 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal /Consent Decree by RYAN ELING, PAUL LECAT, LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC, UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND. (SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
February 6, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Settlement by RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR. and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 2/6/2013 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 3/8/2013. By DEPUTY CLERK: Devon F. Richards. (dfr)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
January 28, 2013 Set Deadlines Per Order #21: Opening Claim Construction Briefs due by 5/28/2013. Response Briefs due by 6/10/2013. Joint Claim Construction Statement due by 6/17/2013.(dfr)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Objection to Scheduling Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting without objection #19 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The plaintiffs' unopposed proposed revised scheduling order is approved. The clerk's office is DIRECTED to file the proposed scheduling order, ECF No. 19-1, as a separate docket entry. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 25, 2013 Filing 19 Proposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by PAUL LECAT, LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC Responses due by 2/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Revised Scheduling Order)(WEBB, NATHAN)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT OF HEARING AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULING-Proposed Revised Scheduling Order due by noon on 1/25/2013. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
January 22, 2013 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 1/22/2013 re: ECF No. 13; report and order to follow. (Court Reporter: No court reporter present) (RICH III, JOHN)
January 16, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order, : Telephone Conference set for 1/22/2013 03:00 PM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Attorney Webb initiating call to chambers. (nrg)
January 16, 2013 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order, filed by LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Scheduling Order)(WEBB, NATHAN)
January 2, 2013 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order, and Motion to Change Track Assignment filed by RYAN ELING, UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND. Reply due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
December 11, 2012 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order, filed by LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC. Responses due by 1/2/2013. (WEBB, NATHAN)
December 7, 2012 Filing 12 Reply to Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim #10 by LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC. (WEBB, NATHAN)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/23/2013. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/30/2013. Motions due by 5/14/2013. Ready for Trial on 8/5/2013. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
November 20, 2012 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by RYAN ELING, UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND.(SCHNEIDER, RONALD)
November 1, 2012 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 3/1/2013)(WEBB, NATHAN)
October 23, 2012 Set Answer Deadline for UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND AND RYAN ELING Per Waivers of Service: Answer due by 11/20/2012.(dfr)
October 22, 2012 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND waiver sent on 9/21/2012. (CLOUTIER, TERESA)
October 22, 2012 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed RYAN ELING waiver sent on 9/21/2012. (CLOUTIER, TERESA)
September 24, 2012 Set Deadlines : Attorney Nathan B. Webb shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/27/2012. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section.(dfr)
September 21, 2012 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan B. Webb filed by TERESA M. CLOUTIER on behalf of LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1034528.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum to Webb Certification)(CLOUTIER, TERESA)
September 21, 2012 Filing Fee Received from LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC: Amount Paid: $350. Receipt Number: 212001429. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: filing fee. Date Paid: 9/21/2012 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
September 19, 2012 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
September 19, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RYAN ELING, UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Eling summons)(bfa)
September 18, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC. (bfa)
September 18, 2012 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 18, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RYAN ELING, UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND with Jury Demand IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO IMMEDIATELY LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY.IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CHECK, THE COURT REQUIRES RECEIPT OF PAYMENT WITHIN 48 HOURS OF THIS FILING., filed by LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/16/2013) (Attachments: #1 Lecat US Patent, #2 video on file in the Clerk's Office)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC v. UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LECAT'S VENTRILOSCOPE LLC
Represented By: NATHAN B. WEBB
Represented By: TERESA M. CLOUTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR PAUL LECAT
Represented By: NATHAN B. WEBB
Represented By: TERESA M. CLOUTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ELING
Represented By: RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NEW ENGLAND
Represented By: RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?