PORTLAND PIPE LINE CORPORATION et al v. CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND et al

Plaintiff: PORTLAND PIPE LINE CORPORATION and AMERICAN WATERWAYS OPERATORS
Defendant: CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND and PATRICIA DOUCETTE
Case Number: 2:2015cv00054
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT (A) TO HAVE COUNT VII OF THE COMPLAINT (CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATION) DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND (B) TO SUBSTITUTE MATTHEW LeCONTE FOR PATRICIA DOUCETTE granting in part and denying in part 257 Motion to Amend By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER and JUDGMENT By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jwr)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE CONCERNING SUMMARY TABLES granting 210 Motion in Limine To Exclude Summary Tables Without Underlying Data By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE CONCERNING STATEMENTS OF CITY OFFICIALS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC granting 208 Motion in Limine to Admit Into Evidence Statements by City Officials and Members of the Public; denying 209 Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant and Inadmissable Statements By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS) Modified on 6/13/2018 to correct title of document # 208(CCS).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR VIEW re: 206 Defendants' Motion for View By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment; overruling and dismissing 148 Objection By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 194 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER on Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) denying 88 Motion to Dismiss; denying 172 Motion in Limine By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jwr)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying in part and deferring ruling in part 172 Defendants' Motion in Limine. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER on Filing Deadlines. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 INTERIM ORDER holding in abeyance 87 Motion for Summary Judgment; 88 Motion to Dismiss; 88 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw) Modified on 5/11/2017 to indicate this is an Interim Order(sfw).
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave to File; granting 101 Motion for Leave to File; granting 105 Motion for Leave to File; granting 109 Motion for Leave to File By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (ccs)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORTLAND PIPE LINE CORPORATION et al v. CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND PIPE LINE CORPORATION
Represented By: CATHERINE R. CONNORS
Represented By: MATTHEW D. MANAHAN
Represented By: NOLAN LADISLAV REICHL
Represented By: ERIC J. WYCOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN WATERWAYS OPERATORS
Represented By: CATHERINE R. CONNORS
Represented By: MATTHEW D. MANAHAN
Represented By: NOLAN LADISLAV REICHL
Represented By: ERIC J. WYCOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF SOUTH PORTLAND
Represented By: JESSE HARLAN ALDERMAN
Represented By: MARK A. BOWER
Represented By: SALLY J. DAGGETT
Represented By: JONATHAN M. ETTINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA DOUCETTE
Represented By: JESSE HARLAN ALDERMAN
Represented By: MARK A. BOWER
Represented By: SALLY J. DAGGETT
Represented By: JONATHAN M. ETTINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?