INMAN v. RIEBE et al
Plaintiff: FRANK INMAN
Defendant: WENDY RIEBE, ROBERT CLINTON and GEORGE STOCKWELL
Case Number: 2:2015cv00080
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER adopting 101 Report and Recommended Decision for 100 Motion for Relief from Judgment filed by FRANK INMAN; dismissing 100 Motion for Relief from Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 100 MOTION filed by FRANK INMAN. Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER adopting 91 Report and Recommended Decision for 87 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE STOCKWELL, WENDY RIEBE, and ROBERT CLINTON; granting 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE STOCKWELL, WENDY RIEBE, ROBERT CLINTON. Objections to R&R due by 7/18/2016. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER adopting 83 Report and Recommended Decision for 69 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FRANK INMAN and 80 Order to Show Cause. Denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 73 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER adopting 50 Report and Recommended Decision for 40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FRANK INMAN; denying 40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 54 Motion for Recusal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part 27 Report and Recommended Decision for 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GEORGE STOCKWELL, WENDY RIEBE, ROBERT CLINTON; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 22 Report and Recommended Decision for 7 Motion for Bail filed by FRANK INMAN; denying 7 Motion for Bail. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INMAN v. RIEBE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK INMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY RIEBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE STOCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?