MADDOCKS v. PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: DALE MADDOCKS
Defendant: PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT, MICHAEL SAUSCHUCK, JESSICA BROWN, FRANK HEATH GORHAM, HENRY JOHNSON, COUNTY OF CUMBERLAND, KEVIN JOYCE, UNKNOWN CUMBERLAND COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPUTY and UNKNOWN CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS
Case Number: 2:2015cv00168
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Affirming the Recommended Decision of the Magistrate Judge 68 Report and Recommended Decision for 52 Motion for Sanctions filed by PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT, HENRY JOHNSON, FRANK HEATH GORHAM, JESSICA BROWN, MICHAEL SAUSCHUCK and joine d by CUMBERLAND COUNTY, KEVIN JOYCE, ERIK MOODY and DEREK MCCARTY (ECF No. 56); granting 52 Motion for Sanctions; dismissing without prejudice 19 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as to all remaining Defendants. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS) Modified on 6/16/2017 to clarify text (sfw).
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RECOMMENDED DECISION ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 52 MOTION for Sanctions filed by PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT, HENRY JOHNSON, FRANK HEATH GORHAM, JESSICA BROWN, MICHAEL SAUSCHUCK. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP) Modified on 5/25/2017 to clarify text (sfw).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER adopting 65 Report and Recommended Decision for 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT, HENRY JOHNSON, FRANK HEATH GORHAM, JESSICA BROWN, AND MICHAEL SAUSCHUCK; granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT, HENRY JOHNSON, FRANK HEATH GORHAM, JESSICA BROWN, MICHAEL SAUSCHUCK. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KEVIN JOYCE, COUNTY OF CUMBERLAND Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2017 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MADDOCKS v. PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE MADDOCKS
Represented By: CHRIS A. NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SAUSCHUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK HEATH GORHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF CUMBERLAND
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN JOYCE
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN CUMBERLAND COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPUTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?