PERRY et al v. ALEXANDER et al
Plaintiff: ALAN J PERRY, NINA E PERRY and LAURA A PERRY
Defendant: JULIET ALEXANDER and PETER TINKHAM
Case Number: 2:2015cv00310
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Oxford
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER denying without prejudice 281 Motion for Judgment. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting 268 Motion for Court to Deem Settlement Documents Signed and for Sanctions. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER denying 239 Motion for Judicial Aid in Settlement; granting in part 241 Motion for Sanctions; granting 241 Motion for Order Enforcing Settlement Agreement. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying 254 Motion on jurisdiction. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 DECISON AND ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS denying 214 Motion in Limine; mooting 217 Motion in Limine; denying 202 Motion for Sanctions; denying 203 Motion for Sanctions. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER denying request to appoint counsel in 218 Motion to Clarify the Civil Litigant's Constitutional Right to Counsel By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion in Limine to Preclude Consideration of Defendant's Counterclaims. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying without prejudice 107 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Pleadings and Bar Grievances. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER ON DEFENDANT PETER TINKHAM'S MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ADJUDICATION OF DEFAMATION CLAIM re: 143 Motion in Limine By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mjlt)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 DECISION AND ORDER denying 128 Motion to Amend. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES re 34 Motion to Consolidate Cases By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT granting 8 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 8 Motion for Fees By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRY et al v. ALEXANDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN J PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NINA E PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA A PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIET ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER TINKHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?