MURRAY v. WAL-MART STORES INC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID E MURRAY
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC and WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Case Number: 2:2015cv00484
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion to Seal By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY re Overruling 210 Objection ; denying 211 Motion to Stay By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGES MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT re 185 Plaintiff's Objection By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND STAY denying 141 MOTION FOR AN IMMEDIATE CONTINUANCE AND STAY OF ALL DEADLINES DUE TO INTENTIONAL CONCEALMENT OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying 157 Objection to Order on Pending Motions. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS denying 135 Objection; denying 150 Objection By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM DECISION ON REQUEST TO RECONSIDER DISCOVERY RULING. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURRAY v. WAL-MART STORES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID E MURRAY
Represented By: MAX I. BROOKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC
Represented By: PETER F. HERZOG
Represented By: RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Represented By: PETER F. HERZOG
Represented By: RONALD W. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?