BENSON v. WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Plaintiff: MARGARET BENSON
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00114
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER LOCAL RULE 56(h) - Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/17/2017. Response due by 4/17/2017. Reply due by 5/5/2017. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying 22 Motion to Amend Amended Complaint; denying 24 Motion for Sanctions; denying 25 Motion for Sanctions. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENSON v. WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET BENSON
Represented By: GUY D. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST INC
Represented By: PETER F. HERZOG
Represented By: MATTHEW TARASEVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?