BLOOMQUIST JD v. CLOUTIER NP et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C BLOOMQUIST JD
Defendant: CLOUTIER NP, MAINE CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE, CALLOWAY LABS, CHERYL BOUCHEY NP, CONNIE NADEAU PM and OTHER DEFENDANTS UNKNOWN
Case Number: 2:2016cv00337
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE, adopting 15 RECOMMENDED DISMISSAL. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RECOMMENDED DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint filed by WILLIAM C BLOOMQUIST JD. Objections to Recommendation due by 4/13/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 10 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mjlt)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint filed by WILLIAM C BLOOMQUIST JD Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2016 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (ccs)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECOMMENDED DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint filed by WILLIAM C BLOOMQUIST JD. Objections to Recommendation due by 8/5/2016. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (ccs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLOOMQUIST JD v. CLOUTIER NP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C BLOOMQUIST JD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLOUTIER NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALLOWAY LABS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL BOUCHEY NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE NADEAU PM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTHER DEFENDANTS UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?