GAGNON v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Plaintiff: SCOTT GAGNON
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS and MAINE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Case Number: 2:2016cv00547
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 49 Report and Recommendations and granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 12 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 11 Amended Complaint filed by SCOTT GAGNON. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAGNON v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT GAGNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?