BROWNE v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: ALBION SAVAGE BROWNE
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MAINE CORRECTIONAL CENTER SECURITY STAFF and MEDICAL STAFF AND PROVIDERS
Case Number: 2:2016cv00619
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Extend Time; order affirming Report and Recommended Decision 13 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 11 MOTION to Extend Time to Further Amend Claim filed by ALBION SAVAGE BROWNE, 10 Amended Complaint filed by ALBION SAVAGE BROWNE. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting 5 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING the Plaintiffs claims against the Maine Department of Corrections and the Maine Correctional Center, and the Plaintiffs claim based on his work assignments. If the Plaintiff is satisfied w ith what he filed on February 3, 2017, serving as his amended complaint, the court will treat it as such. However, the court will permit the Plaintiff fourteen (14) additional days to amend his complaint further, if he wishes to do so. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint,, filed by ALBION SAVAGE BROWNE. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWNE v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBION SAVAGE BROWNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE CORRECTIONAL CENTER SECURITY STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL STAFF AND PROVIDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?