HAMM v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: GEORGE HAMM
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Case Number: 2:2016cv00627
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 32 Report and Recommendations, re 29 Motion for Attorney Fees By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA filed by GEORGE HAMM. Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2018 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 23 Report and Recommendations By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 15 Social Security Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet Objections to R&R due by 11/14/2017 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMM v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE HAMM
Represented By: FRANCIS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?