TRUMAN v. ARMSTRONG et al

Plaintiff: PETER P TRUMAN
Defendant: PAULA ARMSTRONG and EDIE SMITH
Case Number: 2:2017cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO REOPEN CASE denying 16 Motion to Reopen Case By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
August 31, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE mooting 6 Motion for Order; mooting 8 Motion for Contempt ; mooting 9 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing; adopting 12 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (ccs)
August 11, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint, filed by PETER P TRUMAN Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2017 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUMAN v. ARMSTRONG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER P TRUMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDIE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?