COOK v. MAINEHEALTH et al
Plaintiff: JASON COOK
Defendant: MAINEHEALTH and NORDX
Case Number: 2:2017cv00428
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JON D. LEVY
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT granting 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 17 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NORDX, MAINEHEALTH. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. MAINEHEALTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON COOK
Represented By: COURTNEY MICHALEC HART
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINEHEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORDX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?