SOONG v. BATH IRON WORKS

Plaintiff: RUTH SOONG
Defendant: BATH IRON WORKS
Case Number: 2:2018cv00297
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Sagadahoc
0 Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
1 Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed BATH IRON WORKS waiver sent on 8/17/2018.Answer due by 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Process Receipt and Return)(lrc)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Include Copy of EEOC Charge. The Court construes the motion to request that the documents attached to the motion be included as exhibit to Plaintiff's complaint. The documents are deemed exhibits to the complaint. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (lrc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Include Copy of Plaintiff's EEOC Charge of Discrimination by RUTH SOONG (Attachments: #1 Maine Human Rights Commission Form, #2 U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Form, #3 Maine Human Rights Commission Letter, #4 Letter No. 1 dated 4/30/2018, #5 Letter No. 2 dated 4/30/2018)(lrc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER by RUTH SOONG providing the Court with address to serve defendant. (lrc)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The plaintiff is directed to provide the full name and address for the defendant. After the plaintiff has done so, the Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal may attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver is timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service in hand by the U.S. Marshal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (lrc)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RUTH SOONG Responses due by 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Information Related to Filing Suit Under the Laws Enforced by the EEOC)(mjlt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RUTH SOONG Responses due by 8/27/2018. (mjlt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (mjlt)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by RUTH SOONG (mjlt)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RUTH SOONG (mjlt)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mjlt)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BATH IRON WORKS, filed by RUTH SOONG. (Service of Process Deadline 11/1/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Letter dated May 10, 2018, #2 Exhibit Information Related To Filing Suit Under The Laws Inforced by the EEOC, #3 Exhibit- U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Dismissal and Notice of Rights dated May 10, 2018)(mjlt) Modified on 8/9/2018 to note that additional exhibits to the complaint can be found at #12 pursuant to Order at 13 (mtm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOONG v. BATH IRON WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH SOONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATH IRON WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?