BAKER v. WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Plaintiff: SHANNON R BAKER
Defendant: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Case Number: 2:2018cv00305
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 10/1/2018 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 10/31/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim by SHANNON R BAKER. (KEARNS, MARK) Modified on 8/20/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB (POLANSKY, KEVIN)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/4/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/11/2019. Motions due by 1/25/2019. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (lrc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against SHANNON R BAKER by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB.(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin P. Polansky)(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
August 10, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1883289.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB.(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
August 10, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB: Per Civ.R. 81(a)(3), Answer due by 8/16/2018. (mlm)
August 10, 2018 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/17/2018. (mlm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/17/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: M. Mitchell. (mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mlm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Summons and Complaint PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. (Service of Process Deadline 11/7/2018) Fee due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A State Court Summons and Civil Complaint)(mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER v. WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON R BAKER
Represented By: MARK A. KEARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Represented By: KEVIN P. POLANSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?