GRANT v. ERICKSON AND RALPH INC
Plaintiff: RALPH GRANT
Defendant: ERICKSON AND RALPH INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00309
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Defense Counsel and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 10/10/18 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 11/9/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey Graf. (slg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ERICKSON AND RALPH INC. (RICH, TARA)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/7/2019. Motions due by 2/21/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/6/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 13, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/20/2018. (mnw)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ERICKSON AND RALPH INC.(RICH, TARA)
August 16, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1886403.), filed by RALPH GRANT.(MANCUSO, PETER)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ERICKSON AND RALPH INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERICKSON AND RALPH INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RALPH GRANT. (Service of Process Deadline 11/13/2018) Fee due by 8/15/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRANT v. ERICKSON AND RALPH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH GRANT
Represented By: PETER GAETANO MANCUSO
Represented By: PETER G. MANCUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICKSON AND RALPH INC
Represented By: TARA A. RICH
Represented By: SARA S. HELLSTEDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?