JACKSON & MACNICHOL et al v. WILKIE
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRA M JACKSON, JACKSON & MACNICHOL and JORDAN L ZORETIC
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 2:2018cv00324
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by JACKSON & MACNICHOL (JACKSON, FRANCIS)
September 21, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for ROBERT WILKIE Per Order #6: Answer due by 10/5/2018. (sfw)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall answer the plaintiffs' complaint by October 5, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by ROBERT WILKIE Responses due by 10/11/2018. (CONCANNON, JAMES)
September 6, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for ROBERT WILKIE : Answer due by 9/21/2018. (sfw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JACKSON & MACNICHOL, ALEXANDRA M JACKSON, JORDAN L ZORETIC. ROBERT WILKIE served on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(JACKSON, FRANCIS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROBERT WILKIE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney summons, #2 Attorney General summons)(bfa)
August 20, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1888103.), filed by JACKSON & MACNICHOL.(JACKSON, FRANCIS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JACKSON & MACNICHOL, ALEXANDRA M JACKSON, JORDAN L ZORETIC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/19/2018) Fee due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 2/9/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI, #2 Exhibit 2 fax copy of 2/9/17 letter, #3 Exhibit 3 3/13/18 letter to Mr. Hooper, #4 Exhibit 4 fax copy of 2/11/18 letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals re: Bruce Hooper, #5 Exhibit 5 fax copy of 3/21/18 response letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals, #6 Exhibit 6 6/2/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI re: Charlie Wilder, #7 Exhibit 7 fax copy of 6/2/17 letter, #8 Exhibit 8 2/7/18 letter to Mr. Wilder, #9 Exhibit 9 fax copy of 4/30/18 letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals re: Charlie Wilder, #10 Exhibit 10 9/14/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI re: Calvin McCune, #11 Exhibit 11 fax copy of 9/14/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI re: Calvin McCune, #12 Exhibit 12 2/5/18 letter to Mr. McCune, #13 Exhibit 13 fax copy of 6/29/18 letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals re: Calvin McCune, #14 Exhibit 14 6/5/18 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs re: Stanley Kressin, #15 Exhibit 15 fax copy of 6/5/18 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs re: Stanley Kressin, #16 Exhibit 16 6/26/18 letter to Stanley Kressin, #17 Exhibit 17 6/27/18 letter to Mr. Kressin)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON & MACNICHOL et al v. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRA M JACKSON
Represented By: FRANCIS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON & MACNICHOL
Represented By: FRANCIS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN L ZORETIC
Represented By: FRANCIS JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: JAMES D. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?