ENDICOTT et al v. MARCUS et al
Plaintiff: TINA A ENDICOTT and DENISE T MEDINA
Defendant: GEORGE MARCUS and MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00331
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
2 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by GEORGE MARCUS, MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA.(GRYGIEL, STEPHEN)
September 19, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for GEORGE MARCUS and MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA : Answer due by 10/19/2018. (akr)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to October 19, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by GEORGE MARCUS, MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRYGIEL, STEPHEN)
September 7, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for GEORGE MARCUS and MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA -per Summonses Returned Executed filed on 9/7/2018, defendants were served on 9/4/2018: Answer due by 9/25/2018. If the parties wish for the deadline to be extended, they must file a motion. (lrc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed by TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA. MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA served on 9/4/2018. (WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE) Modified on 9/10/2018 to clean up docket text (lrc).
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA. GEORGE MARCUS served on 9/4/2018. (WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE) Modified on 9/10/2018 to clean up docket text (lrc).
September 5, 2018 SET Deadlines : Attorney shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/12/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Barton Goplerud filed by CHRISTIANE D. WILLIAMS on behalf of TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1894984.) (WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan L. Rosca filed by CHRISTIANE D. WILLIAMS on behalf of TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1894979.) (WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian O. Marty filed by CHRISTIANE D. WILLIAMS on behalf of TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1894978.) (WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Scarlato filed by CHRISTIANE D. WILLIAMS on behalf of TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1894972.) (WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE)
August 23, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1889976.), filed by TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA.(WILLIAMS, CHRISTIANE)
August 23, 2018 Case Randomly Reassigned to JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (jwr)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (jwr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GEORGE MARCUS, MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Marcus Clegg Bals & Rosenthal)(jwr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEORGE MARCUS, MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA with Jury Demand filed by TINA A ENDICOTT, DENISE T MEDINA. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/20/2018) Fee due by 8/24/2018.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENDICOTT et al v. MARCUS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE MARCUS
Represented By: STEPHEN G. GRYGIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCUS CLEGG BALS & ROSENTHAL PA
Represented By: STEPHEN G. GRYGIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA A ENDICOTT
Represented By: CHRISTIANE D. WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRIAN O. MARTY
Represented By: PAUL J. SCARLATO
Represented By: J. BARTON GOPLERUD
Represented By: ALAN L. ROSCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE T MEDINA
Represented By: CHRISTIANE D. WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRIAN O. MARTY
Represented By: PAUL J. SCARLATO
Represented By: J. BARTON GOPLERUD
Represented By: ALAN L. ROSCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?