SALAS v. TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC

Plaintiff: DIANA SALAS
Defendant: TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00340
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/6/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/13/2019. Motions due by 2/27/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/6/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (sfw)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC.(STROCK, DAVID)
September 4, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC : Answer due by 9/18/2018. (akr)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Record, #2 Littler Letter re Notice of Removal, #3 Legal-Ease letters re acknowledgment and complaint, #4Notice of Appearance - David Strock, #5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons, #6 State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7Complaint and Summary Sheet)(STROCK, DAVID) Modified on 9/5/2018 to clean up docket text (lrc).
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC. (STROCK, DAVID)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 18, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC Responses due by 9/21/2018. (STROCK, DAVID)
August 28, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1892138.), filed by TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC.(STROCK, DAVID)
August 28, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC : Answer due by 9/4/2018. (bfa)
August 28, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/4/2018. (bfa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/4/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-305. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/26/2018) Fee due by 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Exhibit summary sheet, #3 Exhibit summons, #4 Exhibit acknowledgment of service, #5 Exhibit notice of filing removal)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAS v. TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUELINE PUBLISHING LLC
Represented By: DAVID A. STROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA SALAS
Represented By: JEFFREY BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?