CANTARA v. CIGNA CORPORATION

Plaintiff: MARC CANTARA
Defendant: CIGNA CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv00344
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff with Certificate of Service by MARC CANTARA. (AUDIFFRED, JAMES) Modified on 9/17/2018 to change event from Stipulation of Dismissal to Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff (sfw).
September 7, 2018 Reset Deadlines Per Order #8: State Court Record due by 9/14/2018. (sfw)
September 7, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for CIGNA CORPORATION Per Amended Order #9: Answer due by 9/20/2018. (sfw)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 20, 2018 (amending previous order setting deadline of September 20, 2016). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File State Court Record. Time is extended to September 14, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 20, 2016. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court Record by CIGNA CORPORATION Responses due by 9/28/2018. (NOONAN, KYLE)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CIGNA CORPORATION Responses due by 9/27/2018. (NOONAN, KYLE)
August 31, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for CIGNA CORPORATION : Answer due by 9/6/2018. (sfw)
August 31, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1893564.), filed by CIGNA CORPORATION.(NOONAN, KYLE)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/7/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CIGNA CORPORATION. (sfw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Statement of Claim PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CIGNA CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 11/28/2018) Fee due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle Noonan, #2 Exhibit A : Statement of Claim from Small Claims Court, #3 Exhibit B: Summary Plan Description)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANTARA v. CIGNA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC CANTARA
Represented By: JAMES L. AUDIFFRED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA CORPORATION
Represented By: KYLE M. NOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?